This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 09:45:57 (UTC).

HACKER VS ESTRUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2013 HACKER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESTRUP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2549

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HACKER, EUGENE P., Jr.

Defendants

ESTRUP, HECTOR PAUL, Jr.

ESTRUP, LINDA LAVAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 4/21/2014 ~ calid=2424782 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:06/06/2014, Courtroom:BR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DPG, SystemDate:2/6/2014 3:50:16 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: $6,071.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: PREVIOUSLY ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PLANTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT - #2A DEMAND OF COMPLAINT DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 6/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Department BR, 132 EAST COSO ST, RIDGECREST, CA 93555, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 6/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Department BR, 132 EAST COSO ST, RIDGECREST, CA 93555, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: HECTOR PAUL ESTRUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • DocketDeclaration and Order to Post Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Docket185D Pmt: Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for HACKER, EUGENE P. JR (PL-1). Received from HACKER, EUGENE P. JR, check no(s) 23058. Receipt #757458 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST TO POST-NO ORDER SUBMITTED FOR SIGNATURE, PLEASE ATTACH EXHIBITS TO REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for HACKER, EUGENE P. JR (PL-1). Received from HACKER, EUGENE P. JR, check no(s) 23018. Receipt #752280 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Feb 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Feb 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VINING, SHERI CONNELLY