This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 14:56:55 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ VS HONESTO, Jr.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HONESTO, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3410

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ, DAVID

GUTIERREZ

Defendants

HONESTO, REYMUNDO RUIZ, Jr.

CALIFORNIA FARMS, LLC

ROSEMARY FARMS

HONESTO, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAULKNER, JAMES L

Defendant Attorney

MOTOOKA, MARJORIE E

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Mitchel Brim Re: Request for Dismissal Reason: This case has been consolidated. Please file all documents into the Lead Case # BCV-19-103410. Also please list all Consolidated case numbers on any documents being filed. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re: Motion to Consolidate; party to Renotice

Ruling

Ruling 03/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 03/08/2021 (D17) Time Estimate 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Joe and Jon Hildebrand Brothers, Inc. and David Servin Gutierrez ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Mitchel Brim Re: Request for Dismissal Reason: This case has been consolidated. Please file all documents into the Lead Case # BCV-19-103410. Also please list all Consolidated case numbers on any documents being filed. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: 4/8/2020; Motion: to Consolidate *** RENOTICE Deft; California Farms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: from 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 06/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: as to Defendant California Farms LLC DBA Rosemary Farms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to California Farms LLC dba Rosemary Farms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to California Farms, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/31/2020; Served: 12/17/201910:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less