Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 07:59:08 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ ET AL VS DELK ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2618

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, JANET

GUTIERREZ, ALEJANDRO

Defendants

PEREZ-DOMINGUEZ, CINDY ESTEYSI

DELK, LAREN T.

DE LA CRUZ SILVA, ELVIS

AMERICAN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMERICAN, INC.

PEREZ, CINDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPELL, SCOTT E

Defendant Attorneys

SEITA, CAROL ANN M.

D'OYEN, MARLON

 

Court Documents

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 11/2/17 Defendant, AMERICAN, INC. and LAREN T. DELK Motion for Complete Consolidation of Case No. BCV-17-101538 with Case No. BCV-16-102618 ResID: 27276

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/5/17 Defendant, AMERICAN, INC. and LAREN T. DELK Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ResID: 27034; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SEITA, CAROL ANN M.; Defendant; Attorney: SEITA, CAROL ANN M.

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 09/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/15/17 Defendant, AMERICAN, INC. and LAREN T. DELK Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Civil ResID: 25509 **************************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. LACK OF PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLIENTS. *************************************************

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-19-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Motion's x2 Missing Fee's

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Motion's to Compel - 2 Motions both missing Reservations

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/16/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: t/e 5 to 7 days jury for all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FCMC SET 04/02/18 9AM DEPT 11 JURY FOR ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Motion to Compel - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2/13/2018 PLAINTIFFS ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ AND JANET GARCIA MOTION FOR ORDER AS TO LAREN T. DELK ResID: 29136

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice of Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: RE: MOTION FOR ORDER AS TO LAREN T. DELK HEARING:3/14/2018 TIME: 8:30 AM DEPARTMENT: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Ruling and Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate 12/07/2017: Motion to Consolidate 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/2/17 Defendant, AMERICAN, INC. and LAREN T. DELK Motion for Complete Consolidation of Case No. BCV-17-101538 with Case No. BCV-16-102618 ResID: 27276 (Continued from 12-7-17 to 2-8-18); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SPELL, SCOTT E; Plaintiff; Attorney: SPELL, SCOTT E; Defendant; Attorney: SEITA, CAROL ANN M.; Defendant; Attorney: SEITA, CAROL ANN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Elvis De La Cruz Silva. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Cindy Esteysi Perez-Dominguez. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS to American, Inc., A California Corporation. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Defendant, American, Inc.'s Request for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant , American, Inc.'s Answer to the Complaint of Plaintiffs, Alejandro Gutierrez and Janet Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/16/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEITA, CAROL ANN M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'OYEN MARLON PATRICK