This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:16 (UTC).

GUILLEN VS GUILLEN (D)

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 GUILLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUILLEN D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Benavides, Jose R., Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K., Gill, Susan M., Bittleston, Dawn and Canaday, Jim R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4640

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Benavides, Jose R.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

Canaday, Jim R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUILLEN, DANA

Respondent

GUILLEN, AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P

Respondent Attorney

THOMAS, EDWARD J

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.OO; Parties Present Petitioner: GUILLEN, DANA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V S/S C/S ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONT FROM 03/15 *1; Parties Present Petitioner: GUILLEN, DANA; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GUILLEN, AARON; Privately Retained: THOMAS, EDWARD J

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 03/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $520.00; Parties Present Petitioner: GUILLEN, DANA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • Motion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Canaday, Jim R; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 4/03/18 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: CONT 9/21/17 11/16/17 12/21/17; Parties Present Petitioner: GUILLEN, DANA; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GUILLEN, AARON; Privately Retained: THOMAS, EDWARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 1/04/18 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Department/Division: C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Stipulation to Continue and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: NEW HRG DATE: 1/04/18 OLD HRG DATE: 12/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: CONT 9/21/17 11/16/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent; Privately Retained: THOMAS, EDWARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Stipulation to Continue and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: NEW HRG DATE: 12/21/17 OLD HRG DATE: 11/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: CONT 9/21/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent; Privately Retained: THOMAS, EDWARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.OO; Parties Present Petitioner: GUILLEN, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: HRG 11/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: THIRD PARTY TYPING SERVICE: A SIMPLE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less