This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:27:37 (UTC).

GUETA VS ROBLES DE DIOS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GUETA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBLES DE DIOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4159

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUETA, ESTEBAN ALVAREZ

Respondent

ROBLES DE DIOS, FRANCISCO J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: VICTOR CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: VICTOR CRUZ LDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less