This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:06:18 (UTC).

GUERRERO VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 04/05/2016 GUERRERO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0121

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUERRERO, PATRICIA MACIAS

Respondent

GUERRERO, FACUNDO VALDIVIA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: GUERRERO, PATRICIA MACIAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less