This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 08:50:43 (UTC).

GUERRERO CALLEJA VS VALLEY PLAZA MALL, LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 GUERRERO CALLEJA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLEY PLAZA MALL, LP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2902

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO CALLEJA, EMILIANO SAID

Defendants

VALLEY PLAZA MALL, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

VICTORY SIGNS, INC., A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS OF FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT, KENNETH E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/30/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Kenneth E Wright RE: Civil Case Cover Sheet REASON: outdated form CM-010

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc, a Delaware Corporation, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Valley Plaza Mall, LP, a Delaware limited partnership, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/25/20221:40 PM; Served: 01/25/20221:40 PM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Kenneth E Wright RE: Civil Case Cover Sheet REASON: outdated form CM-010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/30/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Comment: Appointing Olga Guadalupe Calleja Rodriguez as Guardian Ad Litem of Emilano Said Guerrero Calleja, a minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY PLAZA MALL, LP, A DELAWARE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT KENNETH E. ESQ.