This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:21 (UTC).

GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP VS JAQUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5902

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP

Defendants

QUINONES III, ELIAS

JAQUEZ, VIOLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOUZANE, JOHN E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: JAQUEZ, VIOLET; QUINONES III, ELIAS; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $556.00; Holdover Damages: $1,192.50; Attorney Fees: $350.00; Costs: $560.00; Total: $2,658.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: judgment by court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF LOST ORIGINAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: VIOLET JAQUEZ ; ELIAS QUINONES lll

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: ELIAS QUINONES lll

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: VIOLET JAQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP; Served: 10/11/20177:09 PM; Served: 10/11/20177:09 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2113 BUENA VISTA ST #A, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less