This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:24 (UTC).

GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC. VS REYES

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5772

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.

Defendant

REYES, RUBY IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, MATTHEW H.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.; Awarded Against: REYES, RUBY IRENE; Amount; Damages: $15,164.81; Costs: $479.00; Total: $15643.81; Party: Names: GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.; REYES, RUBY IRENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to RUBY IRENE REYES; signed by Linda S Etienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Request for Court's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Request for Court's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: as to RUBY IRENE REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to RUBY IRENE REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO RUBY IRENE REYES, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: returned via attorney bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 17, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.