This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:08:56 (UTC).

GRIMES VS SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2015 GRIMES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4458

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRIMES

GRIMES, SERENITY

Defendants

SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL

SCI CALIFORNIA FUNERAL SERVICES, INC.

CALIFORNIA CEMETARY AND FUNERAL SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREIMAN, LAWRENCE W

Attorney at FREIMAN LAW

100 Wilshire Blvd #940

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

cmc mo: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: filed by Lawrence Freiman, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Docket4153 Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - cmc mo: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Docket4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to California Cemetary and funeral services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to defendant Service Corporation International

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to defendant SCI California Funeral Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV284458_150403_133750 SUMMONS AND ADDITIONAL PARTIES eFax document: FAX-31546.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM AT LEAST ONE PARTY SHOULD BE NAMED PRIOR TO STATING " ADDITIIONAL PARTIES ATTACHED" RETURNED VIA US POSTAL/ CASE FAXED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 06, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 06, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY LAWRENCE W. FREIMAN, ESQ. CMC 9/21/15 815AM D-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV284458_150324_145958 SUMMONS eFax document: FAX-31331.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV284458_150324_145941 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET eFax document: FAX-31332.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV284458_150324_145856 COMPLAINT eFax document: FAX-31330.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.