This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 10:30:39 (UTC).

GRIGGS VS MADDEN

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 GRIGGS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MADDEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0322

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRIGGS, DANIELLE Y.

Respondent

MADDEN, BEAU DENE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.