Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 06:33:48 (UTC).

GRIFFIN VS GRIFFIN

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 GRIFFIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRIFFIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0107

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRIFFIN, JEREMY

Respondent

GRIFFIN, EMMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SILVA, WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: GRIFFIN, JEREMY; GRIFFIN, EMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Summons Served 9/11/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Respondent's Response-Marriage & Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Summons Served 8/4/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVA, WAYNE