This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:07:27 (UTC).

GREWE VS GREWE

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 GREWE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GREWE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn, Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5811

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREWE, MICHAEL

Respondent

GREWE, MELANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOCH, WILLIAM A

44540 10Th St W

Lancaster, CA 93534

Respondent Attorney

BERCHAN, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Court Trial

Court Trial 06/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Parties Present Petitioner: GREWE, MICHAEL; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: GREWE, MELANIE; Attorney: BERCHAN, ROBERT

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

01/13/17 MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing

12/22/16 MO: Ex Parte: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Dropped

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Review

11/07/16 MO: Review: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GREWE, MICHAEL; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 09/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Petitioner

04/18/16 MO: Request for Order: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent; Attorney: BERCHAN, ROBERT

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 08/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 06/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 03/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 03/06/17: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Mandatory Settlement Conference

06/27/16 MO: MSC / Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GREWE, MICHAEL; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: GREWE, MICHAEL; GREWE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for GREWE, MICHAEL (PE-1). Received from MICHAEL GREWE, check no(s) 2494. Receipt #833272 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.