This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 16:01:54 (UTC).

GREENBERG ET AL VS S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 GREENBERG filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against S S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Barmann, Bernard C., Jr., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1364

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALES, TONY

ROJAS, YESENIA

GREENBERG, BRANDEN

SIDHU, AMY

LUTU, GEORGE

RAMOS, ROBERTO

SIDHU, DAVID

MEDINA, ANTONIO R

GONZALES, MELBA

JIMENEZ, SALVADOR

RIVERA, ROBERT, Sr.

RAMOS, MARCY

GREENBERG, GRACIELA

MEDINA, MONTELONGO MARLA

GALLEGOS, ABBYGAIL

JUNIOUS, MAURICE

MAYORGA, SANDRA

Defendants

D&A PREMIER PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RIVER RANCH COMMUNITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Defendant Attorney

FELD, JASON DANIEL

Other Attorneys

RANGEL, JOANN M. O.

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

CRESPO, DANIEL A

DER, KENDALL P.

MURPHY, JASON M

FIDGER, ANGELA R

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

RUTHERFORD, KARI L

BAYS, STEPHEN D

GOLDBERG, TRACY W

HASKINS, KEITH A

ARABI, ARASH S

BERNSTEIN, ROBERT G

BRAASCH, DEBRA L

CRISLER, TED R

MARANTZ, PAMELA

CABRAL, CARLOS C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Amendment to Complaint - NEED TO RE-SUBMIT WITH A DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDGE'S REVIEW AND APRPOVAL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason Feld Re: Proof of Service Summons Reason: Please indicate if parties served are authorized for service.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason Dnaiel Feld For: Amendment to Cross-Complaint Reason: MUST HAVE DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDGE'S SIGNATURE OR PROPOSED ORDER MUST BE SUBMITTED.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Iileen Khanyan Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint, In the caption box on the left please name at least one plaintiff and one defendant, don't just state "And Related Cross-Actions" -In the body of the Answer it states you are responding to Cross-Complaint of Castle & Cookie California but it actually looks like you are Answering to S & S Homes of the Central Coast, which is correct for this case. -The filing fee for a Complex Case is $1435.00 and you originally submitted $435.00. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 03/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/28/19 Intervenor, BENCHMARK INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT DEARBORN DRYWALL, INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION Motion to Allow Benchmark Insurance Company to Intervene and file a Complaint -in-Intervention on behalf of it's insured Dearborn Drywall, Inc., a Suspended California Corporation ResID: 34319

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Status of Remaining Proof of service on X-Deft (defautl or answer) - Cont'd 3/13/19

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Angela R. Fidger For: Case Management Statement Reason: No Case Management Conference scheduled for the date being listed on Case Management Statement.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason M Murphy For: Case Management Statement Reason: No Case Management Conference is set for this case on the date being listed on Statement.

Ruling

Ruling 12/03/2019: Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement 01/30/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/27/19 Defendant, S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ResID: 36740

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Tina L. Schoneman For: Request for Dismissal Reason: Missing Attorney's signature.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/02/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: as why matter shouldn't be dismissed pursuant to CRC 3.1385 Hearing continued per standing order *** COMPLAINT HAS BEEN DISMISSED - CROSS-COMPLAINTS REMAIN PENDING ***

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, cross complaints remain pending***

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/12/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, XC remain pending cont'd from 06/02/20 and 07/16/20

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: status of Bankruptcy crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, XC remain pending cont'd from 06/02/20 and 07/16/20

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: status of Bankruptcy and crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, XC remain pending cont'd from 06/02/20 and 07/16/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Cross-Complaint filed by S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc. - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: status of Bankruptcy crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, XC remain pending cont'd from 06/02/20 and 07/16/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 06/02/2021 Notice of Reassignment addressed to Tina L . Schoneman returned to the court undelivered. Re-mailed to address as follows: 1500 Palma Dr. Ventura Ca. 93303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Reassignment Unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Continuance of OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/12/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: crc 3.1385 ***complaint has been dismissed, XC remain pending cont'd from 06/02/20 and 07/16/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OSC Statement re: Settlement Compliance and Dimissal

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Plaintiffs' First Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional Homeowners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Amendment to Complaint - NEED TO RE-SUBMIT WITH A DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDGE'S REVIEW AND APRPOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Plaintiffs' Roberto & Marcy Ramos, David & Amy Sidhu - ONLY - without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO RIVER RANCH COMMUNITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPLANY & D&A PREMIER PROPERTIES, LLC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPLANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/24/2018; Served: 07/24/2018; Served: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRAL, CARLOS C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARANTZ, PAMELA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAASCH, DEBRA L