Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:47 (UTC).

GRECO VS ALVAREZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 GRECO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0041

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRECO, ELIZABETH

Defendants

ALVAREZ, JULIAN

LONEHILL, REGINA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEBIG, STEVEN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GRECO, ELIZABETH; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3900 Mt Pinos Way Frazier Park, CA 93225; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ALVAREZ, JULIAN; LONEHILL, REGINA M; Party: Names: GRECO, ELIZABETH; ALVAREZ, JULIAN; LONEHILL, REGINA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 3900 Mt Pinos Way Frazier Park, CA 93225

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Julian Alvarez and Regina M. Lonehill and All Adult Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to Regina M. Lonehill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to Julian Alvarez

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Any and All Unknowns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GRECO, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 3900 MT. PINOS WAY FRAZIER PARK, CA 93225 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less