This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:11:46 (UTC).

GRAYSON VS GARFIELD JETTER, BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMIN BY THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSONS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 GRAYSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GARFIELD JETTER, BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMIN BY THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSONS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0956

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAYSON, DOUGLAS W

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMIN ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

GARFIELD JETTER, BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMIN BY THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSONS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on January 7, 2019

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/07/2019: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 10/29/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 08/27/2018

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 06/25/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 12/18/17, 03/19/18, and 04/23/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 12/18/17 and 03/19/18; Parties Present Plaintiff: GRAYSON, DOUGLAS W

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 12/18/17; Parties Present Plaintiff: GRAYSON, DOUGLAS W

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

CMC/Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Dismissal as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on October 23, 2017.; Parties Present Plaintiff: GRAYSON, DOUGLAS W

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/30/2017: Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on August 21, 2017.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/21/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on January 7, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 1/7/19 Minute order & 1/9/19 Notice of Order to Appear addressed to Douglas W Grayson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 3/11/19, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/07/2019: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 10/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Douglas Grayson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 1/7/19, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 06/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/21/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketOrder for Publication of Summons - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: copy mailed to plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketApplication for Publication of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: AMENDED 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/21/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN (G)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 5/15/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less