Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 08:13:53 (UTC).

GRAY VS LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 GRAY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2518

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY, LINDA

Defendants

LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEHME, ANTHONY T

Defendant Attorneys

SNIDERMAN, JONATHAN S.

SNIDERMAN, JONATHAN S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 915am case but set at 830am - motion to consolidate to be filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 04/27/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 4/27/21 @ 9:15 am in Dept. 11 - Jonathan S. Sniderman to appear by telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: Opposition to Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Notice of Related Case with BCV-19-103119 Tracy Perle v. Los Padres Estates Property Owners Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANT LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Reassignment to DRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Los Padres Estates Property Owners Association, an unincorporated association via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/22/20204:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNIDERMAN, JONATHAN S.