Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 04:47:01 (UTC).

GRAY VS LOS PADRE ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 GRAY filed an Other lawsuit against LOS PADRE ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1757

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY, LINDA

Defendant

LOS PADRE ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK, MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC IN RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC IN RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC IN RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT **REQUEST TO APPEAR VIA COURT CALL GRANTED 11/15/19**

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 09/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: no appearance by counsel on 7/2/19

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 07/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CONT'D FROM 4/30/20 FOR COUNSEL TO SUBMIT JUDGMENT

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 04/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC IN RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 03/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC in re: Entry of Default Judgment

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC IN RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear - Comment: and Show Cause Why This Matter Should not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC IN RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC IN RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT **REQUEST TO APPEAR VIA COURT CALL GRANTED 11/15/19**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketRequest - Telephonic Appearance - Comment: and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 09/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: 1B Does not conform to the Complaint (Plaintiff)/ #2 fee's do not conform to prayer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 -100

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 03/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC in re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Defendant Los Padres Estates Property Owners Association, an unincorporated association on Complaint Filed 7/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 01/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to defendant Los Padres Estates Property Owners Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/01/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY BIN**ACTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.