This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:42:25 (UTC).

GRAY VS BAKER CAL VENTURE, LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 GRAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAKER CAL VENTURE, LP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0824

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY, BERNARD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

M.D. ATKINSON CO., INC.

JTS CONSTRUCTION

BAKER CAL VENTURE, LP

BAKER CAL VENTURE, L.P.

Cross Defendants

JAMES E. THOMPSON, INC. DBA JTS CONSTRUCTION

BAKER CAL VENTURE, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOOTH, JASON M

CLARK, STEVEN C

BASSETT, ROBERT D

CARTER, DANIEL L

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, per minutes dated 01/10/2020 case was dismissed with prejudice

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/23/2019, 12/09/2019 **as to complaint ONLY**

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, per phone conversation with Craig Johnson on 01/09/20, request was accepted in error by the Clerk. A fee waiver was filed in this case and page two of the request was not completed. Please correct form and resubmit

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/23/2019

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to COMPLAINT only as to Cross-Complaint JTS CONSTRUCTION

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to COMPLAINT only

Ruling

Ruling 04/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of service states Case Management Statement was served. Returned via efile

Ruling

Minute order 10/11/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

MInute Order 10/10/18: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order 10/2/18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BAKER CAL VENTURE, LP; PARTY BAKER CAL VENTURE, LP IS A DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. PLEASE SPECIFY THE ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL AS TO DEFENDANT ONLY? OR DEFENDANT/ CROSS COMPLAINANT? PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Steven Clark Re: Case Management Statement Reason: Case is assigned to Judge Thomas S Clark in Department 17. Date time and department are incorrect on your document. Case Management Conference is set for 11-16-17 at 8:15 a.m. in Department 17.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Order Dismissing Action Jason M Booth Re-mailed 1/31/2020 to 11835 W Olympic Blvd., Suite 600E, Los Angeles, CA 90064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, per minutes dated 01/10/2020 case was dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/23/2019, 12/09/2019 **as to complaint ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Cross-Complaint by JTS Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, per phone conversation with Craig Johnson on 01/09/20, request was accepted in error by the Clerk. A fee waiver was filed in this case and page two of the request was not completed. Please correct form and resubmit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to COMPLAINT only as to Cross-Complaint JTS CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: As to Judge Sidney P. Chapin, filed by Craig E. Johnson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO BERNARD GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/1/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/23/2017; Served: 08/01/2017; Served: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO BERNARD GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.