This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 07:28:57 (UTC).

GRAVES VS GRAVES (C)

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 GRAVES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRAVES C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2582

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRAVES, SHEILA

Respondent

GRAVES, KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FALK, GREGORY P

Respondent Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: 6/15/21 PET RFO S/S ATTY F/C HEALTH INS CONT FROM 7/30/21 08/31/21 T/E: 1 HOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/15/21 PET S/S ATTY F/C HEALTH INS *RES'S 1ST CONT FROM 7/30/21*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Response of Employee Pension Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: E-FILED HRG 8/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: HRG 8/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306) - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: E-FILED NEW ATTY: GREGORY P. FALK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: E-FILED Substitution of Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: E-FILED JOINDER CALPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPleading on Joinder-Employee Pension Benefit Plan - Comment: E-FILED CALPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Joinder Employee Benefit Plan (EBP) and Order - Comment: E-FILED CALPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: E-FILED Typing Service Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less