This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:27:57 (UTC).

GRANDE VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GRANDE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0138

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANDE, RODRIGO

Defendant

TORRES, KARLA GUILLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GRANDE, RODRIGO; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 9805 Buzz St. Lamont, CA 93241; Awarded Against: TORRES, KARLA GUILLEN; Party: Names: GRANDE, RODRIGO; TORRES, KARLA GUILLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GRANDE, RODRIGO; Served: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Personal Service as to Karla Guillen Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 9805 BUZZ ST LAMONT CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less