Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/14/2021 at 07:18:20 (UTC).

GRANADOS VS DEL CID

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 GRANADOS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEL CID. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2422

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANADOS, HENRY

Defendants

DEL CID, OFELIA P

DELCID, OFELIA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DESSY, FAWN KENNEDY

DESSY, RONALD D

Defendant Attorney

LALAZARIAN, DAVID

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Filing of Recorded Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LALAZARIAN DAVID