This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 18:38:19 (UTC).

GORJIKIA VS ABEL MARTIN ALVAREZ, SR.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 GORJIKIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABEL MARTIN ALVAREZ, SR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2168

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GORJIKIA, YEKTA

GHAFELEHBASHI, PEROZEH

GORJIKIA, NIYAYESH

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ALVAREZ, VERENICE E.

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

ABEL MARTIN ALVAREZ, SR. A.K.A. ABEL M. ALVAREZ

GEICO

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN, MICHAEL M

Defendant Attorney

SPENCER, MICHELLE M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 5TH CONTINUANCE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Requst for Dismissal, a Request for Dismisal of Cross-Complaint was filed and accepted on 10/18/19. The Complaint remains pending.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/04/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385, as to Complaint Only

Ruling

Ruling 10/18/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: The stipulation has a proposed order attached. This proposed order is not necessary. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and order rejected: Per conversation with Danna on 4/2/19, Geico will be filing Stip and order along with first paper filing fee. Returned via efile

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 12/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 5TH CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice, entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Requst for Dismissal, a Request for Dismisal of Cross-Complaint was filed and accepted on 10/18/19. The Complaint remains pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/04/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/06/2020: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2020: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4TH CONTINUANCE. COUSNEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO HAVE FILED EECLARATION EXPLAINING WHY PLAINTIFF'S HAVE BEEN UNABLE TO COMPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Michael M. Marzban in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/04/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/06/2020: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/04/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 5 days FCMC/JT 12/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Geico Indemnity Company. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS to Geico Casualty Company. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Verenice E. Alvarez. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Abel Martin Alvarez, SR. aka Abel M. Alvarez. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:01/02/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/25/2017; Served: 11/25/2017; Served: 01/05/2018; Served: 11/14/2017; Served: 11/14/2017; Served: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less