This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/03/2021 at 11:12:02 (UTC).

GORDEN ROESCH DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 GORDEN ROESCH DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2766

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

JANZEN, GARY STEVEN

FOUNDATION MINERALS, LLC

CENTENNIAL RESOURCE PRODUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

MARSHALL, JARED CALVIN

BURNSIDE, LEIGH W

HOLLIS, KEITH J.

HUNCKLER, TRACY K

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 09/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - WWA NOTES- 1. Attachment 3g(1)(c) states conditional declinations and nominations are attached. Need conditional declinations and nominations. 2. Need certified copy of Judgment for Final Distribution on spouse, Helen E Roesch's estate (related case no. 32030). 3. Is there a probate filed for Margaret Hoover and Lynn Hahn? Need certified copy of order and Letters if any.

Ruling

Ruling 09/27/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney to attorney Richard Nervig

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection etc. to attorney's Richard Nervig & Keith Hollis for Foundation Mineral's, LLC.

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 01/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES- 1. Need certified copy of Judgment for Final Distribution on spouse, Helen E Roesch's estate (related case no. 32030). 2. Is there a probate filed for Margaret Hoover and Lynn Hahn? Need certified copy of order and Letters if any.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: copy request.....returned via AMS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: copy request......returned via AMS

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to revoke Probate returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Response to attorney Leigh W. Burnside

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Response & (2) declarations to attorney's Tracy K. Hunckler and Ryan P. Mahoney

Petition

Petition 08/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- [Supplement to] Notice of Hearing on Petition and Petition to Revoke Probate, or Alternatively, for Order Determining Jurisdiction of Specific Property; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Keith J Hollis in Support Thereof

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Order after hearing; mailed back to attorney

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER AFTER HEARING MAIL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 11/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Status Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing on Foundation Minerals, LLC's Petition to Revoke Probate or, Alternatively, For Order Determining Jurisdiction of Specific Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: 8/12/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER AFTER HEARING MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice - Comment: Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Order after hearing; mailed back to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 08/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- [Supplement to] Notice of Hearing on Petition and Petition to Revoke Probate, or Alternatively, for Order Determining Jurisdiction of Specific Property; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Keith J Hollis in Support Thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Lynda Chung to Richard Nervig

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney to attorney Richard Nervig

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/27/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 09/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - WWA NOTES- 1. Attachment 3g(1)(c) states conditional declinations and nominations are attached. Need conditional declinations and nominations. 2. Need certified copy of Judgment for Final Distribution on spouse, Helen E Roesch's estate (related case no. 32030). 3. Is there a probate filed for Margaret Hoover and Lynn Hahn? Need certified copy of order and Letters if any.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice - Comment: Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 9/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTENNIAL RESOURCE PRODUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNCKLER, TRACY K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnside, Leigh W