This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:26 (UTC).

GONZALEZ VS GONZALEZ (B)

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 GONZALEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALEZ B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Cannon, Gloria and Falk, Gregory P.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1770

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Cannon, Gloria

Falk, Gregory P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ, JUAN

Respondent

GONZALEZ, PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18 2/25/19, 05/20/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18 2/25/19

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 02/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 11/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Original Type: Family Centered Case Resolution; Family Centered Case Resolution 09/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Falk, Gregory P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18 2/25/19, 05/20/19 8/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: STATUS: 10/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18 2/25/19, 05/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 05/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18 2/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 02/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18 11/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 11/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 9/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Original Type: Family Centered Case Resolution; Family Centered Case Resolution 09/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 09/18/18 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.