Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 10:24:22 (UTC).

GONZALEZ VS GEORGE A. BICS PLUMBING, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GEORGE A BICS PLUMBING, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2636

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, EDUARDO

Defendant

GEORGE A. BICS PLUMBING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, BEN

Defendant Attorney

KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/25/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProtective Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Stipulated Protective Order *** GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to George A. Bics Plumbing, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Reassignment to Dep. 11A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to George A. Bics Plumbing, Inc. via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/30/20208:47 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/25/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K