Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 07:44:58 (UTC).

GONZALEZ ET AL VS FIRST CHOICE AUTO SALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 GONZALEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST CHOICE AUTO SALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S., Cervantes, Gina and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2393

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Cervantes, Gina

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, ORLANDO

SANCHEZ, HUGO ENRIQUE

GONZALEZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALTAONE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

FIRST CHOICE AUTO SALES

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

FOMBONA, GERSON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR, KASRA

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ORMONDE, BRANDON M

STEAD, CALVIN R

CURRAN, JAMES D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CURRAN, JAMES D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 02/22/21

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 11/03/20, 12/14/20

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/14/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 11/03/20

Ruling

Ruling 08/19/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Please resubmit in the following order as one filed document: POS-010 followed by POS-015.

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 08/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 07/29/2020 6/10/2020 Plaintiff's Orlando Gonzalez and Hugo Enrique Sanchez Arbitratoin, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitratio Forum, Request for Stay and Request fo Costs

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt is not a valid form of Service on it's own, this is an attachment. Please resubmit Notice attached behind Judicial Council form POS-010.

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 07/29/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/10/2020 Plaintiff's Orlando Gonzalez and Hugo Enrique Sanchez Arbitratoin, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitratio Forum, Request for Stay and Request fo Costs;

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Reply to Defendant, Altaone Financial Services, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration Duplicate filing received.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Amendment to Complaint DOE 21

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/20/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Trial in Dept 12 on 7/13/22. No T/E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 02/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to defendant Altaone Federal Credit Union only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Ohio Casualty's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: request for extension to file responsive pleadings is granted to no later than 7/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: Affidavit Re Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/19/202010:19 AM; Served: 05/20/202011:15 AM; Served: 05/18/20201:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/20/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST CHOICE AUTO SALES is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant