This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 18:14:11 (UTC).

GONZALEZ ET AL VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 GONZALEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2070

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, ANUAR

GONZALEZ, YOLANDA

GONZALEZ, LIZET

POWELL, JOSH

Defendants

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HODGES, NATHAN M

Defendant Attorney

CASTRONOVO, TOD M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Nathan Hodges RE: Summons REASON: section, 'Notice to the Person Served' was not left blank.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

Ruling

Ruling 12/06/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/06/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to California Automobile Insurance Company, a California corporation via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/14/202111:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Nathan Hodges RE: Summons REASON: section, 'Notice to the Person Served' was not left blank.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRONOVO TOD M. ESQ.