Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:55:44 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, ET AL VS ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 GONZALEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVARADO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Turner, Jerold L., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Turner, Jerold L.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, EVA

DAYAN, YAIL

GONZALEZ, ERNESTO

Defendant

ALVARADO, ADELA

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO- Unlawful Detainer: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DAYAN, YAIL

Demurrer

MO 8/13/15: Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed by Adela Alvarado, In Pro Per; Parties Present Plaintiff: DAYAN, YAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Staley, H. A. "Skip", Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 213 Zimmerman Street Arvin, CA 93241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Signed Pursuant to C.C.P. 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: DAYAN, YAIL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 213 Zimmerman Street Arvin, CA 93203; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ALVARADO, ADELA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,000.00; Costs: $600.00; Other: $800.00; Other Comment: As of 08/20/15 the fair rental value is $800.00. $40.00 shall be added each day until the premises is vacated.; Total: $4,400.00; Party: Names: GONZALEZ, ERNESTO; GONZALEZ, EVA; DAYAN, YAIL; ALVARADO, ADELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO- Unlawful Detainer: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - MO 8/13/15: Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed by Adela Alvarado, In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Adela Alvarado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Hearing Date: 8/13/2015 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GONZALEZ, ERNESTO, GONZALEZ, EVA, DAYAN, YAIL; Served: 07/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 213 ZIMMERMAN STREET ARVIN, CA 93203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less