This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 09:25:42 (UTC).

GONZALES VS HALLCON CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 GONZALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HALLCON CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES, DONALD

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

TERRASAS, LYNN

HALLCON CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

HALLCON CORPORATION

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLS, STEVE W

Defendant Attorneys

MARDEN, RYAN K

GIBBONS, ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Proof of Service already on file, if Amended, document should state so.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; filed into the wrong case number, incorrect case number, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ***continued from 04/162020 per Standing Order ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: by Union Pacific Railroad Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to Lynn Terrasas, ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AMENDED as to Union Pacific Corporation, a Corporation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Proof of Service already on file, if Amended, document should state so.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant Hallcon Corporation's Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; filed into the wrong case number, incorrect case number, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Union Pacific Corporation, a Corporation, via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Hallcon Corporation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 01/17/20204:14 PM; Served: 02/06/202010:49 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.