This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:45 (UTC).

GONSER ET AL VS DE ECHEVERRIA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 GONSER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DE ECHEVERRIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1726

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, JESUS

GONSER, FELICIA

Defendant

DE ECHEVERRIA, LILIAN A. FAJARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'NEIL, THOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/17/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on July 17, 2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 9/18/17, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/17/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less