This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:24:26 (UTC).

GONCALVES VS ANAYA HOSPITALITY INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 GONCALVES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANAYA HOSPITALITY INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2522

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONCALVES, INGER

Defendants

ANAYA HOSPITALITY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RED ROOF INN BAKERSFIELD, UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERBIN, ANTHONY W.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/10/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Red Roof Inn Bakersfield, an unknown entity, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Anaya Hospitality, Inc, a California corporation, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/23/20219:27 AM; Served: 12/22/202110:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/10/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERBIN ANTHONY W.