This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 17:18:47 (UTC).

GOMEZ VS SANTOYO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 GOMEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANTOYO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6588

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, ELVA

Defendants

SANTOYO, ROBERTO

SANTOYO, MANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ELVA GOMEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ARMANDO ESPINOSA CERTIFIED TO INTERPRET THE SPANISH LANGUAGE, PRESENT TO INTERPRET PROCEEDING FOR PLAINTIFF. OATH ON FILE. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT, ROBERTO SANTOYO. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT, MANA SANTOYO. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR $6,000.00 AGAINST DEFENDANT'S IS GRANTED. CLERK TO SERVE MINUTE ORDER ON BOTH SIDES. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ELVA GOMEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ROBERTO SANTOYO (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MANA SANTOYO (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. GLORIA HUGHES PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR PLAINTIFF AND BOTH DEFENDANT(S). ALSO PRESENT: REPRESENTATIVE FROM INSURANCE COMPANY. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. DEFENDANT(S) TO PAY PLAINTIFF $6,000.00. IF PAYMENT HAS BEEN MADE, CASE TO BE DISMISSED AND DEFENDANT'S NEED NOT BE PRESENT AT NEXT HEARING. IF DEFENDANT'S ARE NOT IN COMPLIANCE THEN COURT TO PROCEED WITH COURT TRIAL CAUSE CONTINUED TO MARCH 13, 2015 AT 9:00AM FOR COURT TRIAL/DISMISSAL THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Form - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Form - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: PLAINTIFFS CLAIM $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Docket853F Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $5,000 but not - Comment: Amount of $75.00 for GOMEZ, ELVA (PL-1). Received from ELVA GOMEZ. Receipt #817817 for amount of $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.