This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:29 (UTC).

GOMEZ VS GOMEZ (D)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 GOMEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GOMEZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Gill, Susan M., Benavides, Jose R. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1905

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

Benavides, Jose R.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ, NOE MARIO

Respondent

GOMEZ, DEIDRA RAQUEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/17/19 RES S/S MOD JUDG CONT'D FROM 6/03/19 *1

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 4/17/19 RES S/S MOD JUDG NO SERVICE

Family Centered Case Resolution

04/10/2018 MO: FCCR/ADVANCE FOR COURT TRIAL-DISSOLUTION: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/26/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH HRG 8/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: HRG 08/14/19 MAILED TO RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/17/19 RES S/S MOD JUDG CONT'D FROM 6/03/19 *1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 8/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 06/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 4/17/19 RES S/S MOD JUDG NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 6/3/19 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: E-FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 5/19/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less