This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/24/2020 at 14:09:30 (UTC).

GOMEZ VS GILL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GILL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D., Clark, Thomas S. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0797

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Clark, Thomas S.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ, ISRAEL JR.

GOMEZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF JARNAIL SINGH GILL

GILL, JASWINDER K.

KINCO GENERAL CONSTRUCTION

KINCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS

RIGBY'S WELDING, INC

RIGBY'S WELDING, INC.

GILL

KINKO GENERAL CONTRACTORS

Cross Defendants

ALI, SALEH SAEED

RIGBY'S WELDING INC.

NOE GUTIERREZ DBA SNG HANDYMAN SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHN, DAVID K

SCHOEPFER-ALTMILLER, FELICIA

SCHOEPFER, FELICIA L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

O'DRISCOLL, BRIAN H

PLESSALA, BRIAN M

FLORES, ZOJEILA I

FRANKENBERGER, DAVID J

TURIGLIATTO, JON A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

TURIGLIATTO, JON A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David J. Frankenberger Re: Cross Complaint, duplicate Cross Complaint was already filed 1/9/2019.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David J. Frankenberger Re: Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Brian M Plessala For: Amendment to Cross-Complaint Reason:Cross-Complaint has been dismissed as of 9/17/18.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 11/01/17. 11/28/17 01/30/18 02/28/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 11/01/17. 11/28/17 01/30/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 11/01/17 11/28/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SCHOEPFER-ALTMILLER, FELICIA

Further Case Management Conference

Original Type: Further Case Management Conference; Further Case Management Conference 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 10/10/17

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/27/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Association of Counsel: Please list the remaining Defendant only. Also missing both signatures of attorney's, as well as the information of the associating attorney. The Clerk's office needs to verify the attorney is in good standing with the bar.

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment 12/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/1/19 Defendant, RIGBY'S WELDING, INC. Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Issues ResID: 35933

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 12/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/16/19 Defendant, JASWINDER K. GILL Motion for Summary Judgment ResID: 35867

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David J. Frankenberger For: Stipulation and Order Reason: Must have new reservation ID # for new hearing date being selected for Motion for Summary Judgment.

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:David Frankenberger; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:2nd Rejection for same reason: Party name listed in #3.a. does not match the name on Cross-Complaint filed on 01/09/2019; also the description is not needed.

Ruling

Ruling 04/09/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:David Frankenberger; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Party name listed in #3.a. does not match the name on Cross-Complaint filed on 01/09/2019.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:David Frankenberger; Re:Proof of Hand Delivery; Reason:Document not to be filed pursuant to CRC 3.250 (also the court address shows Kings County)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: TD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: ***continued from 05/13/2020 per Standing Order *** Continued from 2/25 *Date cleared with Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/17/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to select Trial Dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Association of Counsel: Please list the remaining Defendant only. Also missing both signatures of attorney's, as well as the information of the associating attorney. The Clerk's office needs to verify the attorney is in good standing with the bar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 3/9/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone: Zojella I. Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David K. Cohn For: Proposed Order After Hearing Reason:Please remove attachment of copy of Minute order ruling from Proposed Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 02/25/2020: Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ESTATE OF JARNAIL SINGH GILL, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO JASWINDER GILL, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/31/2017; Served: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/27/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less