This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/18/2018 at 04:03:58 (UTC).

GOLDSTONE VS JONES

Case Summary

On 10/14/2015 GOLDSTONE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDSTONE, SAM

Defendant

JONES, JANICE

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: GOLDSTONE, SAM; Defendant: JONES, JANICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GOLDSTONE, SAM; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 309 N. Norma St. Ridgecrest, CA 93555 Kern County; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: JONES, JANICE; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,405.00; Holdover Damages: $352.69; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $720.00; Total: $4,477.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Writ Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL Legal Doc Prep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: GOLDSTONE, SAM; Defendant: JONES, JANICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Kassaye Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Janice Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GOLDSTONE, SAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.