This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 08:52:20 (UTC).

GLORIA MICHELLE MITCHELL CLARK DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 GLORIA MICHELLE MITCHELL CLARK DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALDANA, KASIE SUZANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTERS

Petition for Letters

Amended Petition for Letters 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketBond Undertaking - Comment: $189,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Amended Petition for Letters 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 2/13/20 @8:30am in Div P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.