This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 07:50:58 (UTC).

G.I.M.O.S.A.S. LLC VS RAMOS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 G I M O S A S LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0016

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G.I.M.O.S.A.S. LLC

Defendant

RAMOS, MARISELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR MARISELA RAMOS - RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketRuling - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Request for continuance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: G.I.M.O.S.A.S. LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.