This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:50 (UTC).

GILBERTO PAREDES, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS BOTTLING GROUP, L.L.C. D.B.A. PEPSI BEVERAGES COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 GILBERTO PAREDES, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOTTLING GROUP, L L C D B A PEPSI BEVERAGES COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2284

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILBERTO PAREDES, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

WALTERMIRE, KIRK

Defendants

BOTTLING GROUP, L.L.C. D.B.A. PEPSI BEVERAGES COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOTTLING GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOON, KENNETH H

Defendant Attorney

HARDY, SAMANTHA D

 

Court Documents

Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement

Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 01/08/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/9/19 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Enhancement Payments

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 09/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Set per Stipulation and Order filed 1/31/19. To be heard concurrently with Case Management Conference. ResID: 35821

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 03/28/18

Case Management Conference

Original Type: Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: FINAL Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement - Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 01/08/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/9/19 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Enhancement Payments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Plaintiff Gilberto Paredes in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: re Final Approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Plaintiff Kirk Waltermire in support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Elizabeth Kruckenberg on behalf of Administrator with Respect to Opt Outs and Objections Received

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO BOTTLING GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.