Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:26 (UTC).

GILBERT VS YBARRA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 GILBERT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YBARRA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0879

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILBERT, JOEL

Defendants

YBARRA, JEFFERY

YBARRA, JEFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Jeff Ybarra being sued as Jeffery Ybarra. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Defendant: YBARRA, JEFFERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GILBERT, JOEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1416 2nd St #31 Bakersfield, CA 93304; Awarded Against: YBARRA, JEFFERY; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,380.00; Total: $3,380.00; Party: Names: GILBERT, JOEL; YBARRA, JEFFERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via Attorney messenger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Stipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: Sandra Kuhn McCormack Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Stipulation for Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Jeff Ybarra being sued as Jeffery Ybarra. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Defendant: YBARRA, JEFFERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: as to Joel Gilbert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Answer - Comment: sued as Jeffrey Ybarra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: sued as Jeffrey Ybarra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1416 2ND ST #31 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GILBERT, JOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less