This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 06:41:00 (UTC).

GHUNEEM VS SHARP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2015 GHUNEEM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHARP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0381

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHUNEEM, LIDIA

Defendants

SHARP, MISTY

DAVIS, MISTY

SHARP, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

BOUZANE, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

02/25/16 MO: Order to Show Cause - Certificate of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

03/24/16 MO: Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Party: Names: GHUNEEM, LIDIA; SHARP, TIMOTHY; DAVIS, MISTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2016
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - 03/24/16 MO: Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - 02/25/16 MO: Order to Show Cause - Certificate of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Declaration for Default Judgment, Declaration Re: & Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Complaint date wrong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: H.G. Long & Associates New Attorney: John E. Bouzane

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: TIMOTHY SHARP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: MISTY DAVIS AKA MISTY SHARP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GHUNEEM, LIDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.