This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:24:38 (UTC).

GHOSN VS STOWELL, Sr.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2015 GHOSN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STOWELL, Sr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0150

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHOSN, NADER

Defendant

STOWELL, NORMAN G., Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOUZANE, JOHN E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GHOSN, NADER; Awarded Against: STOWELL, NORMAN G., Sr.; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $0.00; Holdover Damages: $1,600.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $340.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $1,940.00; Party: Names: GHOSN, NADER; STOWELL, NORMAN G., Sr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 10817; Filed Against: 10817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 12/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):Previously entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: H.G. Long & Associates New Attorney:John E. Bouzane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: All unknown occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Norman G. Stowell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GHOSN, NADER; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: FILED ON DEMAND 6E OR 6F NOT MARKED (NO AGREEMENT ATTACHED PURSUANT TO CCP 1166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.