Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 07:05:42 (UTC).

GHOBRIAL VS ABDELMALEK(E)

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 GHOBRIAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABDELMALEK E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Foley, Therese M., Cannon, Gloria, Robertson, Murray J., Bittleston, Dawn and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3617

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Foley, Therese M.

Cannon, Gloria

Robertson, Murray J.

Bittleston, Dawn

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GHOBRIAL, NERMINE

Respondent

ABDELMALEK, IHAB

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANHALT, SHARI

Respondent Attorney

AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/26/19 10/31/2019 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR-2 MINORS *TO BE HEARD FOR JUDGMENT*

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/26/19 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR-2 MINORS *TO BE HEARD FOR JUDGMENT*

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 10/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18 12/11/18 2/13/19 4/11/19 7/16/19 **STATUS**

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 07/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18 12/11/18 2/13/19 4/11/19 **STATUS**; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18 12/11/18; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 12/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GHOBRIAL, NERMINE; Attorney: ANHALT, SHARI; Respondent: ABDELMALEK, IHAB; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 12/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GHOBRIAL, NERMINE; Attorney: ANHALT, SHARI; Respondent: ABDELMALEK, IHAB; Attorney: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 10/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/22/18 COURTS OWN MOTION; Parties Present Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2/20/20 PET PAY COVERED CAL BILL PAY HEALTH INS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: SET FROM 1/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: MSC-PROOF OF SERVICE MISSING DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: E-FILED Settlement Conference Statement Trial Briefs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: E-FILED: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: E-FILED Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Electronic Service - Comment: E-FILED: Proof of Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: E-FILED: Request for Order Hearing FL-300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petitioner - Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 12/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/02/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 2 MINORS (FILED IN BFL-18-2435) **DV DROPPED ON 10/22/18** CONTD FROM 10/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HRG 10/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: E-FILED: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate 10/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/22/18 COURTS OWN MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: E-FILED: Proof of Service of Summons. Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant