This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 10:35:50 (UTC).

GESINGER VS THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF LOUISE J. RICHAUD ALSO KNOWN AS LOUISE JEANNE RICHAUD BRONSON, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 GESINGER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF LOUISE J RICHAUD ALSO KNOWN AS LOUISE JEANNE RICHAUD BRONSON, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0890

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF LOUISE J. RICHAUD ALSO KNOWN AS LOUISE JEANNE RICHAUD BRONSON, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/13/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Affidavit

04/13/2022: Affidavit

Electronic Rejection Notice

04/19/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Order to Show Cause

04/19/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

04/19/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

06/20/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Ex Parte Application & Order

06/23/2022: Ex Parte Application & Order

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

08/02/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/02/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Case Management Statement

10/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

12/14/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Order for Publication of Summons

01/05/2023: Order for Publication of Summons

Case Management Statement

01/05/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

01/17/2023: Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order for Publication of Summons; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to GEORGE RICHAUD, TRUSTEE OF THE LOUISE BRONSON TRUST DATED JANUARY 4, 1991; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to George Richaud, Trustee of the Louis Bronson Trust dated January 4, 1991, via sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ex Parte Application & Order; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATIONFOR ORDER AUTHORIZING TAKINGOF DEPOSITION PRIOR TO SERVICEOF SUMMONS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: RE: Exparte Application for authorizing taking of depositions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/02/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 amHearing Department/Division: L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Craig D. Braun, attorneyRE: Summons- does not conform to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Affidavit; Comment: Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 762.030; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - GESINGER, CONSTANCE PAULINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG D