This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 03:23:16 (UTC).

GERARD VS HARTER

Case Summary

On 07/11/2014 GERARD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2423

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GERARD, WILLIAM F.

WILLIAM F. GERARD ON BEHALF OF THE GERARD HEIRS

Defendants

HARTER, TOM

HARTER, WILLIAM

HARTER ENERGY, INC.

THE HARTER FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS

Attorney at LAW OFC

956 Walnut St #200

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

Defendant Attorney

PLEDGER, JEAN M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

06/08/16 MO - Ruling on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Enforce (Pre-Disposition)

5/31/16 MO: Motion to Enforce: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/2/16 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (C.C.P. 664.6) ResID: 15915 ************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR $80,000.00. ENTITLEMENT AND AMOUNT OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, FEES AND COSTS TO BE DETERMINED ON POST JUDGMENT MOTION. ***************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Plaintiff; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M

Final Case Management Conference

Minute Order - FCMC - 09/11/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES.JURY TRIAL 09/21/15; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - FURTHER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FIRST MSC HELD 8/21/15 BY DRL FURTHER MSC SET BY DRL 9/4/15 ALL PARTIES & COUNSEL ORDERED BACK; Parties Present Plaintiff: GERARD, WILLIAM F.; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. GERARD ON BEHALF OF THE GERARD HEIRS; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Defendant: HARTER, TOM; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant: HARTER, WILLIAM; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant: HARTER ENERGY, INC.; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M

Mandatory Settlement Conference

08/21/15 - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS (D-4)FCMC 9/11/2015 TDS 9/21/2015; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Plaintiff; Attorney: MCGEE, DANIEL MARCUS; Defendant: HARTER, TOM; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M; Defendant; Attorney: PLEDGER, JEAN M

Ruling

Public Minute Order Document Type: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC rule 3.1385 (cont'd from 09/11/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Dismissal entered July 21, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 06/08/16 MO - Ruling on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Enforce (Pre-Disposition) - 5/31/16 MO: Motion to Enforce: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/2/16 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (C.C.P. 664.6) ResID: 15915 ************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR $80,000.00. ENTITLEMENT AND AMOUNT OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, FEES AND COSTS TO BE DETERMINED ON POST JUDGMENT MOTION. ***************************************************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketReply to Opposition - Comment: to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (C.C.P. 664.6) Hearing Date: 5/31/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Dept: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: AS TO HARTER ENERGY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: AS TO WILLIAM HARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: AS TO TOM HARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY DANIEL M. MCGEE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY DANIEL M. MCGEE, ESQ. CMC SET 1/7/15 @8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV282423_140711_151330 CCCS SUMMONS COMPLAINT eFax document: FAX-24166.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.