This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 21:27:52 (UTC).

GERALD BRUCE MADLEY CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 GERALD BRUCE MADLEY CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Wyatt, Ralph Wm., Loo, Cynthia L. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4787

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

WALLACE, BRIAN L

Not Classified By Court

FAMILY COURT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KENDALL, ANDREW B

MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 11/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 10/23/19, fourth accounting and opening of probate estate with request to find that conservatee is deceased have not been filed.

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 03/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Third account

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 10/03/18, third account has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Proof of bond for $175,000 filed 03/27/17 has expired on 05/17/17. 2. Attorney fee's requested in paragraph 9 does not total $3,270 as attorney's declaration filed on 10/10/17 in support of said fees total is $3,180.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 09/28/17, a second accounting has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 03/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Fees

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - RE Inventory and appraisal SAME NOTE: 1. As of 03/15/16, the Inventory & Appraisal has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

Compliance hearing 111615: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 11/3/15, the Inventory & Appraisal has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Estate MO 060815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need proof of mailing.; Parties Present Petitioner: WALLACE, BRIAN L; Attorney: MCGOLDRICK, BERNARD J; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAccounting Initial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Fourth account and report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: compliance hearing re: fourth account and opening of probate estate with request to find that conservatee is deceased.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Miscellaneous Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAccount and Report - Comment: Account and Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 11/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 10/23/19, fourth accounting and opening of probate estate with request to find that conservatee is deceased have not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment and Order Settling Account - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order after hearing on: 1) Third account and report of conservator of the estate; 2) Petition for allowance of fees and costs to conservator and attorneys for conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: identification information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: VERIFICATION THA T VIDEO OF CONSERVATORS DUTIES HAS BEEN VIEWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketDuties of Conservator - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: SET 6/08/15 AT 900 AM DIV:P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Comment: SET 4/30/15 AT 900 AM DIV:P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Docket880D PMT: Probate Petition For Appt of Conservator, - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for WALLACE, BRIAN L (PE-1). Received from MCGOLDRICK AND MCGOLDRICH, check no(s) 7754. Receipt #829450 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Docket824J Pmt: Probate - Petition for Temp Letters GC 70657(A)(4) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for WALLACE, BRIAN L (PE-1). Received from MCGOLDRICK AND MCGOLDRICH, check no(s) 7754. Receipt #829450 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.