This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:37:02 (UTC).

GEORGE MUNOZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 GEORGE MUNOZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2231

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNOZ, GEORGE

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDZANT, BARRY L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/8/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/8/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less