Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:09 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS GONZALES

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GONZALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1054

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GONZALES, NINA RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULUS, CHERIE L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: GONZALES, NINA RENEE; Amount; Damages: $3,714.54; Costs: $299.75; Total: $4014.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S INSURED BRANDI UNDERWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Request for Court Judgment - Comment: as to NINA RENEE GONZALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Nina Renee Gonzales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substitued, as to Nina Renee Gonzales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: returned via U.S. Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-28-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY CHERIE PAULUS CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less