This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:20 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS CEJA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CEJA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6204

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CEJA, CECILIO

PANELLA, RALPH

PANELLA TRUCKING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAULUS, CHERIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR (GEICO STAFF COUNSEL)

14111 Danielson St. Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

PAULUS, CHERIE L

Attorney at LAW OFC DARLENE ROHR - GEICO

14111 Danielson St #100

Poway, CA 92064

Defendant Attorney

VAN EGMOND, COLLEEN F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Receipt for Records Returned - Comment: TRANSFER OF ENTIRE FILE TO COUNTY OF MADERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: BY SUPERIOR COURT COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MADERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • 174B Pmt: Change of Venue GC 70618 EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for CEJA, CECILIO (DE-1). Received from CECILIO CEJA, check no(s) 7608. Receipt #726680 for amount of $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Receipt for Records Mailed - Comment: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MADERA MADERA COURTHOUSE 209 WEST YOSEMITE AVENUE MADERA CA 93637 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: TRANSFER OF ENTIRE CASE UNLIMITED CIVIL COMPLAINT GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO VS CEJA Calendar Notes: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MADERA MADERA COURTHOUSE 209 WEST YOSEMITE AVENUE MADERA CA 93637 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: TRANSFER OF ENTIRE CASE UNLIMITED CIVIL COMPLAINT GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO VS CEJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Notice of Transfer of Case Location - Comment: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MADERA MADERA COURTHOUSE 209 WEST YOSEMITE AVENUE MADERA CA 93637 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: TRANSFER OF ENTIRE CASE LIMITED CASE GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO. VS CEJA Calendar Notes: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MADERA MADERA COURTHOUSE 209 WEST YOSEMITE AVENUE MADERA CA 93637 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: TRANSFER OF ENTIRE CASE LIMITED CASE GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO. VS CEJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • 185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for CEJA, CECILIO (DE-1). Received from ARATA, SWINGLE, SODHI & VAN, check no(s) 7500. Receipt #724245 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • OTHER - Original Type: OTHER; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: 6/3/13 DEFENDANTS, CECILIO CEJA AND PANELLA TRUCKING, LLC TO MADERA COUNTY 6/3/13 DEFENDANTS, CECILIO CEJA AND PANELLA TRUCKING, LLC TO MADERA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Under Supervision - Comment: ODY164585 Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2013
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: [MEMORANDUM OF] IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER CHANGING VENUE TO MADERA COUNTY 6/12/13 8:30 A.M. DEPT. 12 (DEPT. 12 IS DARK; COUNSEL TO RE-NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: FOR ORDER CHANGING VENUE TO MADERA COUNTY 6/12/13 8:30 A.M. DEPT. 12 (DEPT. 12 IS DARK; COUNSEL TO RE-NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY COLLEEN VANEGMOND, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO CECILIO CEJA SUB SERVED 4/11/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (PL-1). Received from GEICO, check no(s) 601520372. Receipt #709872 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY CHERIE PAULUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY CHERIE PAULUS

    Read MoreRead Less