Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:17 (UTC).

GDN OWEN-HOXIE MINORS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 GDN OWEN-HOXIE MINORS was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett, Kohler, Greg J. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2935

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kohler, Greg J.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COWAN, CINDY LYNN

COWAN, TIMOTHY SCOTT

Not Classified By Court

CALLAGHAN, MIRIA

 

Court Documents

Review

Review 03/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON THE PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP

Ruling

Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Review

Review 12/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Review

Review 06/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE: REVIEW OF THE SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON THE PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP PER MEDIATION AGREEMENT ON 12/18/18

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Termination of Temporary Guardianship... Filing Party Miria Callaghan... Pro Per ( C )

Court Trial

Court Trial 12/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANSHIP SAME NOTE- 1. Need personal service to father, David Owen-Hoxie. NOTE RE OBJECTION OF FATHER/DAVID OWEN-HOXSIE FILED 02/21/18. 2. Proof of service attached does not identified person receiving service. Need proof of service to petitioner, Cindy and Timothy Cowan.

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kohler, Greg J.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: of the persons NOTES- 1. Need personal service to father, David Owen-Hoxie. 2. Need DHS letter.; Parties Present Petitioner: COWAN, CINDY LYNN; Petitioner: COWAN, TIMOTHY SCOTT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: application for publication...returned to Cindy Lynn Cowan and Timothy Scott Cowan via pro per bin "C"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: application and order for publication...returned to Cindy Lynn Cowan and Timothy Scott Cowan via pro per bin "C"

Ex Parte Hearing

10/17/2017 MO: Ex Parte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship NOTES- 1. Need Ex Parte Compliance Declaration for mother, Miria Michael Callaghan. 2. Need Ex Parte Compliance Declaration for father, David Own-Hoxie.; Parties Present Petitioner: COWAN, CINDY LYNN; Petitioner: COWAN, TIMOTHY SCOTT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte, temporary & general petitions for guardianship returned via outbasket

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: PETITIO FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketReview - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/18/2020, HEARING CONTINUED*** RE: REVIEW OF THE SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON THE PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP READY FOR HEARING - regarding suspension of guardianship and further proceedings on the petition for guardianship.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 03/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON THE PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: re: suspension of guardianship and visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 12/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 06/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE: REVIEW OF THE SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON THE PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP PER MEDIATION AGREEMENT ON 12/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Guardian: Cindy Lynn Cowan and Timothy Scott Cowan Person/Estate: Person Hearing date: 11/14/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 am in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian - Comment: Hearing date: 10/17/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 a.m. Division: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: and declaration for emergency temporary guardianship Hearing date: 10/17/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 a.m. Division: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte, temporary & general petitions for guardianship returned via outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less